Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wolf Lawrence Lari, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carpenter & Zuckerman, Klein Candice S. Esq., against Eiralhori Jonathan, Rachmanony Goltadj, Rachmanony Itchak, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Irving Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 03, 2004 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2004 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Without prejudice, Entire action of all parties and all causes of action ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department 1, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding Order Re: Reassignment of Case - Completed Judge: Carolyn B. Kuhl |
|
December 01, 2004 | Hearing |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 01, 2004 | Hearing |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
November 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department 51, Irving Feffer, Presiding Affidavit of Prejudice - Granted Judge: Irving Feffer |
|
November 09, 2004 | Hearing |
Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (170.6 CCP (FEFFER); ) Filed by Plaintiff |
|
November 05, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 03, 2004 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.