Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Murata Scott A., filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Barnes Kevin T. Esq, against 1-800-Flowers Retail Inc., represented by Jenkins & Gilchrist, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Highberger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 15, 2004 |
CategoryClaims Involving Mass Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time286 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File - Public | |
April 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
April 29, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 29, 2005 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Scott A. Murata (Plaintiff) |
|
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 30, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
March 28, 2005 | Hearing |
Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT | |
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 Unknown Event Type - Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.