Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Keywest Communications, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brien David R. Law Offices Of, against Korean Tel Inc., Choi Don Ki, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard Fruin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Fruin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2003 |
CategoryOthr Breach Contr/Warr-Not Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeOther Judgment |
Case Cycle Time182 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2004 | Hearing |
Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 30, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Court |
|
June 30, 2004 | Hearing |
Request (FOR COURT JUDGMENT; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department 15, Richard Fruin, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal (FOR FAILURE TO SUBMIT DEFAULTPACKAGE;) - Completed Judge: Richard Fruin |
|
June 25, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice (of brief summary of the case in support of request for court judg- ment ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 25, 2004 | Hearing |
Declaration (of David R. Brien ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 25, 2004 | Hearing |
Declaration (of Ben Wong ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
May 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department 15, Richard Fruin, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PRO-SECUTE THE CASE) - Continued by Court Judge: Richard Fruin |
|
May 19, 2004 | Hearing |
Default Entered (Korean Tel, Inc. and Don Ki Choi, an individual ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
May 10, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.