Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rook Larry, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Girardi Thomas V. Esq., against Grand Lodge Of Free & Accepted Masons, Grand Lodge Of Free And Accepted Masons, Masonic Home For Children In Covina, Masonic Homes Of California, represented by Sedgwick Detert Moran & Arnold, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona Courthouse South with R. Bruce Minto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeR. Bruce Minto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2003 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial1195 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HousePomona Courthouse South |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1930 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Missing at time of scanning | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Case File | |
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department H (Order to Show Cause; Matter Placed Off Calendar) - |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department H (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department H (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department H Unknown Event Type |
|
September 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department H Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - |
|
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department H Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department H Jury Trial |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department H Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter Placed Off Calendar) - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.