Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rubio John, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jones David G. Esq., against British Petroleum, Exult Inc., Ferguson Bruce, Madden Jim, Unterberger Steve, (total of 5) See All represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Joanne B. O'Donnell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoanne B. O'Donnell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2003 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time422 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Confidential Case File | |
February 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Status Conference (Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) - |
|
January 19, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Exult, Inc. (Defendant); Steve Unterberger (Defendant); Jim Madden (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 19, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION | |
December 30, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice Filed by Exult, Inc. (Defendant); Steve Unterberger (Defendant); Jim Madden (Defendant) et al. |
|
December 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Unknown Event Type |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.