Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Holmes Kevin, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Pingel Steven R. Esq., against Walker & Zanger Inc., represented by Farber Mia Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with J. Stephen Czuleger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2003 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time248 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding Closed-ADR - Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior Judge: ADR Neutral |
|
August 09, 2004 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 06, 2004 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order (to postpone filing and service deadline for defendant's motion for summary judgment or alterna- tively, for summary adjudication conformed copy mailed) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 10, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk |
|
May 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department 50, J. Stephen Czuleger, Presiding Initial Status Conference ( Case Management Conference Trial Setting Conference) - Trial Date Set Judge: J. Stephen Czuleger |
|
April 28, 2004 | Hearing |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 20, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice of Continuance Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department 50, J. Stephen Czuleger, Presiding Initial Status Conference (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;.TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE;cont'd to 5/5/04) - Advanced to a Previous Date Judge: J. Stephen Czuleger |
|
April 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department 50, J. Stephen Czuleger, Presiding Court Order - Completed Judge: J. Stephen Czuleger |
|
April 06, 2004 | Hearing |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.