Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marcor Remediation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hunt Ortmann Blasco Palffy & Rossell, against Hygienetics Environmental Services Inc., represented by Payne & Fears Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with ELIHU M. BERLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeELIHU M. BERLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management111 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2000 |
CategoryOthr Breach Contr/Warr-Not Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time214 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 42, ELIHU M. BERLE, Presiding Jury Trial - Vacated Judge: ELIHU M. BERLE |
|
August 24, 2001 | Hearing |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (With prejudice, Cross-complaint filed by Mercury Air Group,Inc. on March 27,2001. ) Filed by Cross-Defendant |
|
August 14, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 03, 2001 | Hearing |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (With prejudice, Cross-complaint filed by Hygienetics Environmental Services,Inc. on February 6,2001. ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
August 02, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 01, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant |
|
August 01, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 42, ELIHU M. BERLE, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Case Dismissed/Disposed Judge: ELIHU M. BERLE |
|
April 24, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
April 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 42, ELIHU M. BERLE, Presiding Status Conference - Trial Date Set Judge: ELIHU M. BERLE |
|
April 05, 2001 | Hearing |
Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Attorney for Deft/X-Deft/X-Comp |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.