Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Washington Mutual Bank Fa, filed a(n) Injunct Relief-Not Dom/Harrassmt (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Frankel & Tennant Professional Corp., against Henderson Dexter A., Henderson Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Arnold Levin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArnold Levin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management201 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2000 |
CategoryInjunct Relief-Not Dom/Harrassmt (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time216 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2001 | Hearing |
Proof of Service ( of order discharging receiver and approving final report and acctg. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 02, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 66, Arnold Levin, Presiding Receiver's Final Acct & Report - Granted Judge: Arnold Levin |
|
August 02, 2001 | Hearing |
Order ( APPROVING RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT AND ACCTG. AND DISMISSING CASE. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 24, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 66, Arnold Levin, Presiding Status Conference - Completed Judge: Arnold Levin |
|
July 16, 2001 | Hearing |
Declaration (OF DOUGLAS TENNANT RE: STATUS OF CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 23, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice (RECEIVER'S INVENTORY & TAKEOVER REPORT ) Filed by Receiver |
|
January 29, 2001 | Hearing |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 22, 2001 | Hearing |
Undertaking (PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 19, 2001 | Hearing |
Undertaking (TODD WEAVER AS RECEIVER ) Filed by Receiver |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.