Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jensen Don S. M.D., Manhattan Weight Control Medical Ctr. Inc, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Petrullo John Patrick Esq., against Ravis & Dominguez, Ravis Mark, represented by Ravis Mark M.D. J.D. Law Office Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David L. Minning presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryDefamation (Slander/Libel) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time127 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2001 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (W/ PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 06, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 61, David L. Minning, Presiding Hearing on Demurrer (C/F 3-19-01) - Demurrer sustained with leave Judge: David L. Minning |
|
March 21, 2001 | Hearing |
Reply/Response Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
March 21, 2001 | Hearing |
Request Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
March 12, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice of Continuance Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per |
|
March 12, 2001 | Hearing |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 09, 2001 | Hearing |
Opposition Document Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 07, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk |
|
February 28, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice (OF FILING CERTIFIED COPIES OF COMPLAINT; ) Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per |
|
February 28, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice (OF ERRATA IN DEMURRER ) Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.