Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
August Gemia D., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kokozian Bruce Esq., against Carnet Insurance Agency, Tig Specialty Ins. Co., Egwuatu Bright, Three Star Insurance Company, represented by Brydon John R. Esq., Haines & Lea A Law Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with James C. Chalfant presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryOthr Breach Contr/Warr-Not Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time431 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department ADR, ADR Clerk, Presiding Closed-ADR - Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior Closed-ADR - Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior Judge: ADR Clerk |
|
May 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department ADR, ADR Clerk, Presiding Closed-ADR - Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior Judge: ADR Clerk |
|
March 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department 13, James C. Chalfant, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal - OSC Discharged OSC RE Dismissal - OSC Discharged Judge: James C. Chalfant |
|
March 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department 13, James C. Chalfant, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal - OSC Discharged Judge: James C. Chalfant |
|
March 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2002 | Hearing |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 18, 2002 | Hearing |
Association of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 03, 2002 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (with prejudice; Complaint as to defendant TIG Specialty Insurance Co and Camel Insurance Agency ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 03, 2002 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (with prejudice; Complaint as to defendant TIG Specialty Insurance Co and Camel Insurance Agency ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.