Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portofino Homeowners Association, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Schimmel Hillshafer & Loewenthal, against Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Insurance Group Of Companies, Fire Insurance Exchange, Fire Underwriters Association, (total of 9) See All represented by Peterson Picker Chow & Freisleben Llp, Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley, Skadden Arps Slate Meaghter & Flom Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ann Kough presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryIns Coverage/Subro (Complex Only) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time361 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2001 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (W/ PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 24, 2001 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (W/ PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 324, Ann Kough, Presiding Other (5-6-04/DO NOT USE) - Matter continued Other (5-6-04/DO NOT USE) - Matter continued Judge: Ann Kough |
|
October 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 324, Ann Kough, Presiding Other (5-6-04/DO NOT USE) - Matter continued Judge: Ann Kough |
|
October 09, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 324, Ann Kough, Presiding Other (5-6-04/DO NOT USE) (on whether to do Class Cert. next) - Matter continued Other (5-6-04/DO NOT USE) (on whether to do Class Cert. next) - Matter continued Judge: Ann Kough |
|
October 09, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 324, Ann Kough, Presiding Other (5-6-04/DO NOT USE) (on whether to do Class Cert. next) - Matter continued Judge: Ann Kough |
|
September 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 26, 2001 | Hearing |
Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
Answer (OF DEFT. FARMERS GROUP, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 18, 2001 | Hearing |
Answer (OF DEFT. FARMERS GROUP, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.