Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pimentel Rafael, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Conway Shea L. Esq., against Lezama Marina, Lezama Marco A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Susan Bryant-Deason presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time103 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OFSERVICE) - Discharged Judge: Susan Bryant-Deason |
|
April 10, 2001 | Hearing |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION W/OUT PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding Order to Show Cause (FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOFOF SERVICE) - OSC held and continued Judge: Susan Bryant-Deason |
|
April 02, 2001 | Hearing |
Declaration Filed by Attorney for Petitioner |
|
March 26, 2001 | Hearing |
Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2001 | Hearing |
Ord to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2000 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.