Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kubota Naoya, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cohen Robert W. Law Offices Of, against Manpuku, Take 5 Inc., Takee International Inc., represented by Gomez Fujioka & Furukawa Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryOthr Breach Contr/Warr-Not Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time180 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 64, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal - OSC Discharged Judge: Kenneth R. Freeman |
|
June 26, 2001 | Hearing |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
May 25, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice (OF SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
May 24, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 64, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding Initial Status Conference - Case Deemed Settled Judge: Kenneth R. Freeman |
|
March 30, 2001 | Docket Event | Notice of Status Conference filed | |
February 08, 2001 | Hearing |
Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 09, 2001 | Hearing |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 28, 2000 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.