Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Regency Savings Bank F.S.B., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wayser Joshua D., against Juan Martinez Revocable Trust, La Cher Andy Estate Of, Martinez Juan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Bruce Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryOthr Breach Contr/Warr-Not Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time237 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2001 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 10, 2001 | Hearing |
Order (APPROVING RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 22, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 59, Bruce Mitchell, Presiding Receiver's Final Acct & Report - Granted Judge: Bruce Mitchell |
|
August 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 59, Bruce Mitchell, Presiding Status Conference - Matter continued Judge: Bruce Mitchell |
|
August 07, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice (WITH RESPECT TO STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 25, 2001 | Hearing |
Declaration Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 25, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 25, 2001 | Hearing |
Motion for an Order Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 18, 2001 | Hearing |
Undertaking Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 59, Bruce Mitchell, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re Prelim Inj - Granted Judge: Bruce Mitchell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.