Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lyles Donna, Lyles Raymond, Pets Are Wonderful Support For People, Paws La, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kasai Wayne T., against Sanchez Carmelita, Sanchez Carmen, represented by Cohen Robert F. Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Lawrence W. Crispo presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryOthr Breach Contr/Warr-Not Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Pursuant To Decl. |
Case Cycle Time195 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 1A, Murray Gross, Presiding Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng - Completed Judge: Murray Gross |
|
December 05, 2001 | Hearing |
Proof of Service (RE: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF CARMELITA SANCHEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 05, 2001 | Hearing |
Order (PRIVATE PLACE ORDER (GRANTED) ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
October 05, 2001 | Hearing |
Ex-Parte Application (FOR PRIVATE PLACE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
September 14, 2001 | Hearing |
Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
September 14, 2001 | Hearing |
Writ issued (LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 04, 2001 | Hearing |
Abstract of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
August 10, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice (of unavailability of counsel fr. 8/13 to 8/26/01 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 11, 2001 | Hearing |
Ex-Parte Application (for order shortening time ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 11, 2001 | Hearing |
Default Judgment Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.