Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ryan Christopher A., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Aprahamian & Friend Law Offices Of, against Three Brand Cattle Company, Milshouse Howard Nicholas, Mil Howard Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Susan Isacoff presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 1999 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 1999 | Hearing |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (******DISM. ENTIRE ACTION****** W/ PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
November 01, 1999 | Docket Event |
in Department 10, Susan Isacoff, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE: FAILURE TO PROCEED WITH DEFAULT) - OSC not held & continued Judge: Susan Isacoff |
|
October 28, 1999 | Hearing |
Notice (NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Plaintiff |
|
September 28, 1999 | Hearing |
Ord to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 23, 1999 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.