Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bonazzola Nydia, Carter Amy N., Eslamboly Sabrina, Hall Danna, Kurnetz Sheila, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Bendich Stobaugh & Strong P.C., Blumenthal & Markham, Krakow & Kaplan Law Offices Of, Rottman Kaplan Llp, against Auxiliary Legal Services, County Of Los Angeles, Office Of Los Angeles County Counsel, represented by Bergman & Dacey Inc., Day Jones, Goldstein & Petito, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Carl J. West presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 1999 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Case File - Public | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Case File | |
June 04, 2007 | Hearing |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Court |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR | |
June 04, 2007 | Hearing |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk |
|
March 06, 2007 | Hearing |
Order Filed by Court |
|
February 17, 2006 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Auxiliary Legal Services (Defendant) |
|
October 26, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO REPORTERS/MONITORS TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL | |
October 26, 2005 | Hearing |
Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by Clerk |
|
October 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 311 Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (Motion to Tax Costs; Denied) - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.