Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aeons Acumen, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by William E. Windham, against Salu Garcia, Jose Garcia Jr., Salud Garcia, Adela Garcia, Jose Garcia, (total of 5) See All represented by Pro Per, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Jorge C. Hernandez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJorge C. Hernandez Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer (Residential) Under $10K (Ba)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions26 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time69 days |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JOSE GARCIA (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JOSE GARCIA JR. (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ADELA GARCIA (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR ADELA GARCIA WAS GRANTED FOR ANSWER TO UD; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ADELA GARCIA IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00SALU GARCIA ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SALUD GARCIA
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SALU GARCIA (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR JOSE GARCIA JR. WAS GRANTED FOR ANSWER TO UD; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY AEONS ACUMEN - BANNING (FORM UD-150).
Date: December 29, 2014HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 2/17/15 AT 8:00 IN BCLRK
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JOSE GARCIA JR. IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY SALU GARCIA IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00COPY(S) MADE
Date: 2014-12-29T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR JOSE GARCIA WAS GRANTED FOR ANSWER TO UD; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00170.6 FILED BY AEONS ACUMEN AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.
Date: 2014-12-29T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AEONS ACUMEN.
Date: January 14, 2015COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 1/14/15, AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1.
Date: 2014-12-29T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF UD TRIAL.
Date: 2014-12-29T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED
Date: February 26, 2015WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: January 14, 2015ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JOSE GARCIA IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.