Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Abdulnaser, Ali filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Pro Per, against The People Of The State Of California, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2015 |
CategoryTraffic Appeal |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Case Cycle Time230 days |
APPELLATE DIVISION JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2016NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE OPENING BRIEF (O/B DUE 1/19/16)
Date: December 28, 2015NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED (APPELLANT'S BRIEF IS DUE BY DEC-04-2015)
Date: November 04, 2015REMITTITUR ISSUED
Date: June 21, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR ISSUED | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT CALENDAR OF APR-22-2016 - APPEAL OF TRAFFIC JUDGMENT REVERSED | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | APPELLATE DIVISION JUDGMENT | |
April 22, 2016 | Hearing | APPEAL OF TRAFFIC JUDGMENT | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-22-2016 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 622 | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | APPEAL OF TRAFFIC JUDGMENT HEARING SET FOR APR-22-2016 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 622 NOTICE SENT BY COURT | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED (RESPONDENT'S BRIEF IS DUE BY FEB-16-2016) FILED BY APPELLANT ABDULNASER, ALI | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE OPENING BRIEF (O/B DUE 1/19/16) | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED (APPELLANT'S BRIEF IS DUE BY DEC-04-2015) | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT ABDULNASER, ALI AS TO RESPONDENT THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.