Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wu, Qui Yu, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Liu, Dache, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 |
Judge: Order to Show Cause re |
||
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 01/22/2021 08:45 AM D- 503 | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Administrative Transfer of Case Within County (Same Jurisdiction) to Hayward Hall of Justi | |
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 02/15/2019 08:45 AM D- 503 | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 01/28/2019 03:30 PM D- 503 | |
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of re: Progress of Family Law Action Filed | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons Filed | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Qui Yu Wu | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.