Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Mileham, Kayla Ann, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Boydine A. Hall presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 25, 2014 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions53 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 |
Judge: Notice of Motion re |
||
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing Re: Notice of Motion re Filed | |
June 22, 2021 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Boydine Hall |
||
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 508 date: 09/28/2021 time: 08:35 AM | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
June 22, 2021 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Boydine Hall |
||
June 22, 2021 |
Judge: Notice of Motion re |
||
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing Re: Notice of Motion re Filed | |
February 23, 2021 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Boydine Hall |
||
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.