Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Vilay VS Vilay (DCSS)
On August 19, 2014 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Thomas J. Nixon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 19, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Dissolution of Marriage
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Case Duration
4 years, 9 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter re Correspondence request has been completed Filed | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Administrative Transfer of Case Within County (Same Jurisdiction) to Hayward Hall of Justi | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing Re: DCSS Notice of Motion for Modification Filed | |
June 03, 2015 |
DCSS Notice of Motion for Modification
Judge: Thomas J. Nixon |
||
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | DCSS Notice of Motion for Modification Filed by Third Party | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 06/03/2015 09:01 AM D- 301 | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Response to Governmental Notice of Motion Filed | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Other Ex Parte | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by mail on Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 303 date: 04/09/2015 time: 09:00 AM | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Petitioner | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Judgment of Dissolution | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail of Summons Filed | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Alexis M Vilay | |
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 04/09/2015 09:00 AM D- 303 | |
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued | |
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Proposed Judgment | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration of Alexis M. Vilay Filed | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Alexis M Vilay | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Community and Quasi-Community Property Declaration Filed | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Sinisam Cam Vilay Filed | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Sinisam Cam Vilay Entered | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail of Summons Filed | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons on Petition Issued and Filed | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Initial Family Law Status Conference 01/02/2015 08:45 AM D- 303 |