Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Konstantopoulos, Harry, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vargas, Elisa, University Of California Retirement System, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Gregory A. Syren presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 05, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1116 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1702 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Findings and Order After Hearing filed 03/27/2019 Filed | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter dated March 14, 2019 Filed | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Filed | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
March 05, 2019 |
Request for Order re: Modification...
Judge: Gregory Syren |
||
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration re: Request for Order re: Modification... Filed | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Harry Konstantopoulos | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.