Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Sacramento, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Chase, Quiana, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 05, 2014 |
CategoryRegistration Of California Support Order |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions450 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time450 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations 1st Supplemental Filed | |
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Quiana Chase Filed | |
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Quiana Chase Entered | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Summons and 1st Supplemental Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations Filed | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons and Supplemental Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations Filed | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Statement for Registration of California Support Order Filed | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail as to Quiana Chase Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.