Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Salaam, Amirah Patricia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Haqq, Mahir Abdul, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Deborah J. Chase presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions227 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1730 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Administrative Transfer of Case Within County (Same Jurisdiction) to Hayward Hall of Justi | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Case Resolution Order Issued | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Centered Case Resolution Conference 10/20/2014 10:00 AM D- 302 | |
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Centered Case Resolution Conference 10/17/2014 09:00 AM D- 302 | |
August 15, 2014 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Deborah Chase |
||
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Appearance, Stipulations, and Waivers Filed | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Granted Effective on 08/15/2014 | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.