Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Thomas, Sayyadina Marie, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Thomas J. Nixon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions188 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Case Cycle Time188 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations Filed | |
June 18, 2014 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Thomas J. Nixon |
||
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 06/18/2014 09:01 AM D- 301 | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion re Child Support,.. Filed by Petitioner | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer to Governmental Complaint Filed for Sayyadina Marie Thomas | |
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations As to Sayyadina Ma | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.