Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Tyler, Donald Le Roy, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Paul Slavit presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Outstanding Court Fees Filed | |
October 06, 2015 |
Request for Order re:...
Judge: Paul Slavit |
||
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
June 02, 2015 |
Request for Order re:...
Judge: Thomas J. Nixon |
||
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 301 date: 10/06/2015 time: 09:05 AM | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.