Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Pimentel, Ismael M., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 27, 2013 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Case Cycle Time77 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations Filed | |
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Ismael M. Pimentel Entered | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Ismael M. Pimentel Filed | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations As to Ismael M. Pi | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.