Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harper, Johnny, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Harper, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions196 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2080 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Administrative Transfer of Case Within County (Same Jurisdiction) to Hayward Hall of Justi | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 303 date: 08/15/2013 time: 09:00 AM | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Johnny Harper | |
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail FL-160 Filed | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Patricia Harper Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.