Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Charles Nguyen, filed a(n) Other Mental Health case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryOther Mental Health |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2008 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | RIESE FEE STATEMENT. | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | FINDINGS AND ORDERS (FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING) WAS FILED ON 01/07/2008 | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL/SETTING ARRAIGN/DETENTION) WAS FILED ON 12/31/2007 | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE/COVER SHEET (CONFIDENTIAL REPORT ENVELOPE) WAS FILED ON 12/31/2007 | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | PETITION - OTHER (PETITION RIESE) WAS FILED BY CHARLES NGUYEN ON 12/31/2007 | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 12/31/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.