Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lynn Fasnacht, Robert A Yensen, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Alan Fasnacht, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Randall J. Sherman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2007 |
CategoryTrust Proceedings |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time2019 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY FASNACHT, LYNN ON 11/19/2009 | |
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE HAS BEEN DISMISSED. | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT - OTHER FILED BY FASNACHT, LYNN ON 11/05/2009 | |
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | STATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY YENSEN, ROBERT A ON 11/03/2009 | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: REPORTER PER DIEM AND JURY FEES FILED 10/5/09 | |
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 10/05/2009 09:00:00 AM. | |
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 10/06/2009 04:04:00 PM. | |
October 06, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES - FULL DAY, 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES - FULL DAY IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10483533 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10307407. | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: REPORTER PER DIEM AND JURY FEES FILED 10/5/09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.