Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jennifer Wideman, Steven A Stathes, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2007 |
CategoryTrust Proceedings |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time2019 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - CERTIFYING A COPY 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 33.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10098601 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 122968. | |
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (ORDER REGARDING PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST) FILED BY STATHES, STEVEN ALEXANDER; WIDEMAN, JENNIFER ON 04/21/2008 | |
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 3.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10098598 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 122965. | |
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event | PETITION (SUBSEQUENT) HAS BEEN GRANTED . | |
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) MISCELLANEOUS MATTER 03/24/2008 09:00:00 AM. | |
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION FOR STATHES STEVEN ALEXANDER ON PETITION (SUBSEQUENT) UPDATED TO GRANTED. | |
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) MISCELLANEOUS MATTER SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2008 AT 09:00:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT FILED BY STATHES, STEVEN ALEXANDER; WIDEMAN, JENNIFER ON 03/18/2008 | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING (NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING) WAS FILED BY JENNIFER WIDEMAN ON 12/27/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.