Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Noriko Taguchi, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Caryl A. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2007 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim (No Civil Case Filed) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time2019 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 06/13/2008 09:00:00 AM. | |
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event | STATEMENT - OTHER (PROOF OF FUNDING OF ANNUITY) FILED BY TAGUCHI, NORIKO ON 06/11/2008 | |
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event | STATEMENT - OTHER (PROOF OF FUNDING OF ANNUITY) FILED BY TAGUCHI, NORIKO ON 06/09/2008 | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 04/25/2008 09:00:00 AM. | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CONTINUED TO 06/13/2008 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2008 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2008 AT 09:00:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (M.O. MISCELLANEOUS MATTERS) FOR 01/30/2008 16:27:31 | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (M.O. MINORS COMPROMISE) FOR 01/18/2008 09:00:00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.