Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Public Guardian, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2007 |
CategoryLps Conservatorship (Wi 5350) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time2071 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (TEXT) FOR 11/21/2007 08:30:00 | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (TEXT) FOR 11/15/2007 09:00:00 | |
November 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE/COVER SHEET (CONFIDENTIAL REPORT ENVELOPE) WAS FILED ON 11/29/2007 | |
November 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL REPORT OF INVESTIGATOR (CONFIDENTIAL REPORT) WAS FILED ON 11/29/2007 | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (ORDER DISM PET FOR APPT OF CONS;TRM & DISCH TMP CON) WAS FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 11/26/2007 | |
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OTHER) WAS FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 11/21/2007 | |
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event | CONSERVATORSHIP HEARING HEARD ON 11/21/2007 AT 08:30:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION CODE WAS ENTERED: ALL JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL | |
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL REPORT OF INVESTIGATOR (CONFIDENTIAL REPORT) WAS FILED ON 11/15/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.