Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Brian O'Brien, Gary E O'Brien, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Caryl A. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2007 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time2071 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 306.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11158834 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10982726. | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER ON FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY O'BRIEN, BRIAN ON 05/31/2012 | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER ON FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED ON 05/22/2012. | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | AMENDED ACCOUNTING FILED BY BRIAN O'BRIEN IS APPROVED PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED BY ALL PARTIES. | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | AMENDED ACCOUNTING HAS BEEN GRANTED. | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION 05/15/2012 09:00:00 AM. | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED 5/15/12 | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 10.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11145154 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10969046. | |
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT - OTHER FILED BY LFG NATIONAL CAPITAL, LLC; LFG SERVICING, LLC ON 05/10/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.