Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ana Druan Jr, Ana R Duran Sr, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Salvador Sarmiento presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2007 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT FILED BY DURAN (PERSON), ANA ROSA ON 07/17/2020 | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION TO TERMINATE GUARDIANSHIP SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP FILED BY DURAN, GAABRIELA ON 07/10/2020 | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | REVIEW OF THE CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/12/2018 | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT FILED BY DURAN (PERSON), ANA ROSA ON 06/11/2018 | |
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY DURAN SR, ANA ROSA ON 05/15/2017 | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT FILED BY DURAN SR, ANA ROSA ON 04/22/2016 | |
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT FILED BY DURAN SR, ANA ROSA ON 05/04/2015 | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) REVIEW HEARING 05/05/2014 01:30:00 PM. | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT FILED BY DURAN (PERSON), ANA ROSA ON 04/28/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.