Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deputy Public Defender, filed a(n) Other Mental Health case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2007 |
CategoryOther Mental Health |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2071 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (TEXT) FOR 10/30/2007 13:30:00 | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (TEXT) FOR 11/01/2007 13:30:00 | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (TEXT) FOR 11/05/2007 13:30:00 | |
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS W&I 5275 & 5276 HEARD ON 11/05/2007 AT 13:30:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION CODE WAS ENTERED: ALL JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL | |
November 01, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (ORDER FOR TRANSPORTATION) WAS FILED BY DEPUTY PUBLIC DEFENDER ON 11/01/2007 | |
November 01, 2007 | Docket Event | CONTINUED/OFF CALENDAR. | |
November 01, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS W&I 5275 & 5276 HEARD ON 11/01/2007 AT 13:30:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (ORDER FOR TRANSPORTATION) WAS FILED BY DEPUTY PUBLIC DEFENDER ON 10/30/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.