Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Gerald A Caterina, Colette F Caterina, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 1999 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (M.O. CHANGE NAME) FOR 02/15/2000 14:00:00 | |
February 15, 2000 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION CODE WAS ENTERED: ALL JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL | |
February 15, 2000 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME HEARD ON 02/15/2000 AT 14:00:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
February 15, 2000 | Docket Event | DECREE NAME CHANGE GRANTED. | |
February 15, 2000 | Docket Event | DECREE CHANGING NAME (ORDER DECREE FOR CHANGE OF NAME) WAS FILED BY GERALD A CATERINA ON 02/15/2000 | |
January 31, 2000 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION (PROOF OF PUBLICATION) WAS FILED BY GERALD A CATERINA ON 01/31/2000 | |
January 12, 2000 | Docket Event | ENTERED IN ERROR. | |
December 30, 1999 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME (OSC CHANGE OF NAME) WAS FILED BY GERALD A CATERINA ON 12/30/1999 | |
December 30, 1999 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE/COVER SHEET (CONFIDENTIAL REPORT ENVELOPE) WAS FILED BY GERALD A CATERINA ON 12/30/1999 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.