Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts YOLO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT with J KENT O'MARA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ KENT O'MARA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseYOLO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2019 | Action | CA: STOP PROCESS | |
March 05, 2019 | Action |
CIV ASMT HRG
Judge: J KENT O'MARA |
|
March 05, 2019 | Action | REQUEST* | |
February 27, 2019 | Action | DMV FTA UPDATE PROC | |
February 20, 2019 | Action | CA: 1ST NTC W/TRIAL | |
February 13, 2019 | Action | TRF FAILURE-C/A ORD | |
December 21, 2018 | Action | PURGE AND DESTROY | |
December 21, 2018 | Action |
ARR - COURTESY NTC
Judge: J KENT O'MARA |
|
December 21, 2018 | Action | TRAF SCHL YES: ELIG | |
December 19, 2018 | Action | TICKET/CITE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.