Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Krista L. White & Assoc. P.S., Bishop White Marshall & Weibel P.S., against Russell Michael C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Stuart M. Rice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStuart M. Rice Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2013 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions101 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time158 days |
Declaration Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Judgment Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: September 18, 2013Miscellaneous-Other Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: September 18, 2013Default Entered Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2013-05-17T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: May 21, 2014Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: May 21, 2014Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Summons Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-05-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: August 29, 2013Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: August 29, 2013Complaint
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 21, 2014Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-05-17T00:00:00Judgment
Date: September 18, 2013Default Entered
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: August 29, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.