Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gardner Adam L., filed a(n) Other Compl-Not Tort Or Complex (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Mcnicholas & Mcnicholas, against Wright Bill, Tarnoff Linda, Los Angeles Metro Family Sercives County, Los Angeles County Of Dept Of Children, Los Angeles County Of, (total of 15) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Bob T. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBob T. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 1997 |
CategoryOther Compl-Not Tort Or Complex (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 1998 | Docket Event |
in Department D, Bob T. Hight, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg. - Order of Dismissal Judge: Bob T. Hight |
|
May 27, 1998 | Docket Event |
in Department D, Bob T. Hight, Presiding Status Conference - Matter continued Judge: Bob T. Hight |
|
May 14, 1998 | Hearing |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 28, 1998 | Docket Event |
in Department D, Bob T. Hight, Presiding Status Conference - Matter continued Judge: Bob T. Hight |
|
March 02, 1998 | Docket Event |
in Department D, Bob T. Hight, Presiding OSC-Failure to Attend Stat. Conf. - OSC Discharged Judge: Bob T. Hight |
|
February 24, 1998 | Hearing |
Declaration (DECL. OF ERIC A. GOWEY IN OPP. TO COURT'S OSC RE: DISMISSAL & SANCS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 15, 1998 | Docket Event |
in Department D, Bob T. Hight, Presiding Status Conference - Matter continued Judge: Bob T. Hight |
|
July 30, 1997 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
July 30, 1997 | Hearing |
Notice (OF RELATED CASES YC023607 IS RELATED TO THIS CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.