Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rbs Citizens N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dreyfuss Firm A Professional Law Corp, against Flores Flormila Colchado, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Patrick T. Meyers presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2014 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time386 days |
General Denial
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: May 13, 2015Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-08-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: January 20, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2014-10-06T00:00:00Order
Date: June 18, 2015Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: May 13, 2015Notice of Ruling
Date: June 29, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.