Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Moreno, Maria Lourdes Zambrano, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions328 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time328 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Interpreter Required During Hearing | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Financial Due Date | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Correction - Submitted in Court | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter - Court Generated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.