Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Roush, Corey Allen, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
June 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic School Certificate Filed | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Over The Counter Minute Order
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Advisement, Plea, and Waiver | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic School Referral | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Arraignment Waived | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Appear by Date Extension (Portal) | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.