Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank Trust Na, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Naiman Law Group, against Robbie Diaz, Peter Diaz, Tony Diaz, Helen Diaz, represented by Pro Per, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Albert J. Wojcik presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlbert J. Wojcik Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer (Residential) Under $10K (Sw)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions231 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time258 days |
SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED ATERIAL FACTS
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT FILED.
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 2/22/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ROBBIE DIAZ (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00DECLARATION OF SHERYL CUEVAS IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ROBBIE DIAZ IS GRA; CLERK M LOPEZ (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00DECLARATION OF MIKE NOVAK-SMITH IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF/TO MSJ BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 4/14/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/23/2016 OF US BANK TRUST NA AND FILED.
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RANDALL D. NAIMAN RE NOTIFICATION OF DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF REMAND FILED
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT BY PETER DIAZ FILED.
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR ROBBIE DIAZ WAS GRANTED FOR PREJUDGMENT CLAIM/COPIES; $256.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RANDALL D. NAIMAN IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES - UD.
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00NOTICE TO FILE DOCUMENTS FROM FEDERAL COURT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RANDALL D. NAIMAN RE NOTIFICATION OF DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF REMAND FILED
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: August 15, 2017NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF TERMINATION/MODIFICATION OF STAY FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA. (FORM CM-181)
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF TERMINATION/MODIFICATION OF STAY FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA. (FORM CM-181)
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: August 15, 2017NOTICE OF TERMINATION/MODIFICATION OF STAY FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA. (FORM CM-181)
Date: August 11, 2017WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED
Date: September 07, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: August 15, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.