Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sammy Landin, An Individual, On Behalf Of Himself, And On Behalf Of All Persons Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against 1St Light Energy Inc., A Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Waters, Robert T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWaters, Robert T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Employment |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by Sammy Landin against 1 Light Energy Inc. and Does 1 through 50. The complaint alleges multiple violations of California labor laws, including unfair competition, failure to pay minimum wages and overt...
Summons issued and filed.
Date: November 19, 2020Case Management Statement filed by 1st Light Energy Inc., a Corporation.
Date: May 07, 2021ACE Attorney Service, Inc. (amount over $25,000) filed by 1st Light Energy Inc., a Corporation.
Date: February 18, 2021Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 10/13/2021 08:30 AM .
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: November 19, 2020Case Management Statement filed by 1st Light Energy Inc., a Corporation.
Date: December 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 2020-9700 Landin Final Approval of Class/PAGA Settlement 1/19/2024 Plaintiffs bring a Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action/PAGA Settlement. The motion is unopposed. Having read the moving p... | |
July 13, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 2020-9700 Landin Preliminary Approval of Class/PAGA Settlement 7/13/2023 Plaintiffs bring a Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action/PAGA Settlement. The motion is unopposed. Having read the mo... | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received by an Sammy Landin in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 838485. | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Kent L. Bradbury in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action and PAGA Settlement filed by Sammy Landin, an individual, on behalf of himself, and on behalf of all persons similarly situated. DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Kyle Nordrehaug in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action and PAGA Settlement filed by Sammy Landin, an individual, on behalf of himself, and on behalf of all persons similarly situated. DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action and PAGA Settlement --- Motion or other paper requesting a hearing filed by Sammy Landin, an individual, on behalf of himself, and on behalf of all persons similarly situated. MOTION FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Sammy Landin in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action and PAGA Settlement filed by Sammy Landin, an individual, on behalf of himself, and on behalf of all persons similarly situated. DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Motion , set for 07/14/2023 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Result: Vacated | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 11/21/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.