Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Thomas, John, Chukwueke, Jessica, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil Petition - Other case in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 01, 2012 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Petition - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time2581 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Draft version of minutes printed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Automatic Civil: Petition Disposition Clock stopped.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case disposed with disposition of Granted.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Disposition for Chukwueke Jessica ,Thomas John ,Amarachi Thomas Jessica Lee on Petition for Change of Name updated to Granted.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Matter heard.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Volume updated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for OSC - Change of Name heard 09/10/2012 09:30:00 AM.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.