Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tillery, Dennis, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Reuveni, Steven, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Sparks, Sheryle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSparks, Sheryle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Automatic Small Claims Disposition Clock has expired.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (retuned unclaimed as to 04/29/11) filed by Tillery, Dennis on 06/14/2011.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial (SC) - Principal $7500.00 plus $85.00 cost. FW scheduled for 05/10/2011 at 08:15:00 AM in B1 was vacated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courtrooms,B1 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial (SC) - Principal $7500.00 plus $85.00 cost. FW restored to 05/10/2011 at 08:15:00 AM in B1 at Stockton.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial (SC) - Principal $7500.00 plus $85.00 cost. FW scheduled for 05/10/2011 at 08:15:00 AM in B1 was vacated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims to Courtrooms,B1
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.