Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vicente, Narciso, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Moore, Sharla, Moore, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Sparks, Sheryle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2011 |
CategoryLimited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Automatic UD Disposition Clock has expired.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Unlawful Detainers to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case security level updated to 1 effective .
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Unlawful Detainers to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Unlawful Detainers
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Full payment was recorded on 03/07/2011 for 755133.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 173 - Answer or other 1st paper <=$10K, 173 - Answer or other 1st paper <=$10K in the amount of 450.00 on 03/07/2011, transaction number 755133 and receipt number 201471.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Address for Sharla Moore selected.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Automatic Fee Waiver Denial Clock started.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Judicial Officer,Sparks, Sheryle to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Unlawful Detainers
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Automatic Fee Waiver Application Clock stopped.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.