Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Edgeworth, Monica M, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2008 |
CategoryLimited Civil Other Collections |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time4068 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side), 141J - Certifying a copy, paper or record in the amount of 26.00 on 03/03/2015, transaction number 1471959 and receipt number 389873.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side) in the amount of 1.00 on 02/19/2015, transaction number 1466327 and receipt number 388269.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of execution (money judgment) issued to San Joaquin County. Releaseed by creditor/partially satisfied, as to (Monica M. Edgewood).
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of satisfaction of judgment filed in Full
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of execution (money judgment) issued to San Joaquin County
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs $0 after Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit $0 , and Declaration of accrued interest $26.09
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request to enter default filed and ENTERED against[DEFT] Monica M Edgeworth;
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration in lieu of originals
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.